Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Smith, David William, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Kenneth A Hill, against At&T Mobility Llc, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Letter | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Research Request - Request for copies from MDR - Request for copies from MDR |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Research Response - Emailed requested copies to MDR - Emailed requested copies to MDR |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Answer - Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Petition - Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Petition |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned EXECUTED 5-12-2020 EXECUTED 5-12-2020 |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation AT&T Mobility LLC Served 05/12/2020 Returned 05/14/2020 | |
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - emailed to atty - emailed to atty |
|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosures - Iss cit Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosures - Iss cit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.