Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mahan Wright, against Soto, David, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bridewell, Wayne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBridewell, Wayne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2015 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Entry ******SCAN BOX 2758****** ******SCAN BOX 2758****** Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice /Jmt (emailed atty, sent to deft) /Jmt (emailed atty, sent to deft) Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Bailiff's Certificate of Call
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridewell, Wayne) Defalt Judgment? Result: Held Defalt Judgment? Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
May 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
January 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter from EZ Messenger w/ SASE Citations Letter Letter from EZ Messenger w/ SASE Citations Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Citation Soto, David Served 01/20/2016 Returned 01/21/2016
Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION & FIRST DISCOVERY REQUESTS-Cit Iss-EZ Messenger PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION & FIRST DISCOVERY REQUESTS-Cit Iss-EZ Messenger Judge: Bridewell, Wayne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.