Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Trisula, Llc, Casas, Carlos E, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Chip N Searcy, Pro Se, against The Fire Chief Of The City Of Cleburne,Texas, The City Of Cleburne, Texas, represented by Fredrick, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeill, John E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Eminent Domain |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officers Hewlett, Sydney B, Hewlett, Sydney B) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance - sent to court - sent to court Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Receipts CMRR 7019 2970 0000 6248 4474 CMRR 7019 2970 0000 6248 4474 Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation CASAS, CARLOS E Unserved
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued - CMRR 7019 2970 0000 6248 4474 - CMRR 7019 2970 0000 6248 4474 Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
August 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
First Amended Defendant's First Amended Motion to Enforce Judgment and for Contempt Defendant's First Amended Motion to Enforce Judgment and for Contempt Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter to Court
Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter Setting Hearing *coordinator sent* *coordinator sent* Judge: Neill, John E. |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter from Court *coordinator sent* *coordinator sent* Judge: Neill, John E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.