Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reeves, Kasey Individually And As Next Friend Of Mckenzie Kimbrell, A Minor, And Landon Tidwell, A Minor, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael J Hindman, against Dickhaut, Amy Denise, Lawson, Kammi Wynn, represented by Christina D. Stone, J Andrew Robertson, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNeill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment/Non Jury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scan Box ***SCAN BOX 3209*** ***SCAN BOX 3209*** Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter -Re: Release of Judgment -Re: Release of Judgment Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice sent sent Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment & Release of Judgment & Release of Judgment Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Neill, John E.) Result: Held
Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order of Dismissal
Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing 11-19-18
Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appointment of Attorney emailed emailed Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem *C Crum* emailed *C Crum* emailed Judge: Neill, John E. Judgment of $6,566.50Awarded To: Landon TidwellAwarded Against: Kasey Reeves |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.