Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Curry, David Scott, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Curry, Lisa Marie, in the jurisdiction of Johnson County, TX, . Johnson County, TX Superior Courts with Bosworth, William C, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBosworth, William C, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 10, 2011 |
CategoryAll Other Family Law Matters |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJohnson County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Mail Sheets TNT Crane & Rigging TNT Crane & Rigging Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Income Withholding Order for Support - signed 9/29/2020 - sent to employer - signed 9/29/2020 - sent to employer Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Scan Box *****SCAN BOX 3585***** *****SCAN BOX 3585***** Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Fee Paid
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bosworth, William C, Jr.) Result: Held
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order In Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice/Order emailed atty emailed atty Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Confirming Hearing - September 16, 2020 @9:00a - September 16, 2020 @9:00a Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
|
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned - EXECUTED 7-23-2020 - EXECUTED 7-23-2020 Judge: Bosworth, William C, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.