Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Crocker, Matthew, Wright, Marianna, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by James Michael Moore, Javier Pena, J. Michael Moore, against Artillery, L.L.C., City Of Mcallen, Cutler Repaving, Inc., Lumber Liquidators, Inc., represented by Austin Wade Stevenson, Lynse L. Guerra, Marion R. Lawler, Iii, Matthew R. Maddox, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2019 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Proposed Order
Date: January 09, 2020Proposed Order
Date: January 09, 2020Notice Sent
Date: January 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Motion for Sanctions Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Motion for Sanctions Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
|
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; ATTY. JAVIER PENA PRESENT; ATTY. AUSTIN WADE STEVENSON PRESENT; ARTILLERY, LLC AND CUTLER REPAVING INC HAVE SETTLED; COUNSEL AGREED TO PASS HEARING; OSH TO BE FILED IF MOTION NEEDS COURT INTERVENTION. CASE CALLED FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS; ATTY. JAVIER PENA PRESENT; ATTY. AUSTIN WADE STEVENSON PRESENT; ARTILLERY, LLC AND CUTLER REPAVING INC HAVE SETTLED; COUNSEL AGREED TO PASS HEARING; OSH TO BE FILED IF MOTION NEEDS COURT INTERVENTION. Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response DEFENDANT CITY OF MCALLEN'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND FOR SANCTIONS DEFENDANT CITY OF MCALLEN'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND FOR SANCTIONS Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed HRG. ON Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Motion for Sanctions set on 3/2/23 at 8:00 a.m -sent to DC on 2/13/23 HRG. ON Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Motion for Sanctions set on 3/2/23 at 8:00 a.m -sent to DC on 2/13/23 Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Lumber Liquidators, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.