Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Gamez, Maria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Savannah Angel Gonzalez, against Gamez, Baltazar, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Leticia Lopez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeticia Lopez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Original Petition for Divorce (OCA)
Date: October 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) DECREE DECREE |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Reporter DIANA PEREIRA DIANA PEREIRA |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called ON FINAL HEARING. ATTY SAVANNAH GONZALEZ PRESENT WITH PETITIONER MARIA GAMEZ VIA ZOOM. NO OTHER PARTY APPEARED. DIVORCE GRANTED. NAME CHANGED GRANTED TO BEATRIZ HERNANDEZ. DECREE TO BE FILED WITH PETITIONER'S SIGNATURE. DP ON FINAL HEARING. ATTY SAVANNAH GONZALEZ PRESENT WITH PETITIONER MARIA GAMEZ VIA ZOOM. NO OTHER PARTY APPEARED. DIVORCE GRANTED. NAME CHANGED GRANTED TO BEATRIZ HERNANDEZ. DECREE TO BE FILED WITH PETITIONER'S SIGNATURE. DP |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) baltazar gamez served 11/19/20 Result: Held baltazar gamez served 11/19/20 |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed FINAL HEARING FINAL HEARING |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON FINAL HEARING AND SET FOR 1/13/21 @10:00 A.M. CLERK TO ISSUE.CD ON FINAL HEARING AND SET FOR 1/13/21 @10:00 A.M. CLERK TO ISSUE.CD |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.