Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gonzales, Christine Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gonzales, Jr., Matias, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children (Oca) |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Motion
Date: October 13, 2020Original Petition for Divorce (OCA)
Date: May 28, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler (4:30 PM) () Was divorce decree filed by Mrs. Alvarado Was divorce decree filed by Mrs. Alvarado |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Hearing (9:30 AM) () *** 11/09/2020 Reset by Court to 11/30/2020 11/30/2020 Reset by Court to 12/14/2020 12/14/2020 Reset by Court to 01/13/2021 | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called Mrs. Alvarado with Mrs. Gonzalez present via zoom. Respondent was not present and has not filed an answer after service. Default divorce entered into the record by Mrs. Alvarado. Court granted the divorce. Order to be submitted. Mrs. Alvarado with Mrs. Gonzalez present via zoom. Respondent was not present and has not filed an answer after service. Default divorce entered into the record by Mrs. Alvarado. Court granted the divorce. Order to be submitted. |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Undeliverable ORDER RESETTING FINAL DEFAULT HEARING ORDER RESETTING FINAL DEFAULT HEARING |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Hearing (9:30 AM) () *** 11/09/2020 Reset by Court to 11/30/2020 11/30/2020 Reset by Court to 12/14/2020 | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER RESETTING FINAL DEFAULT HEARING ORDER RESETTING FINAL DEFAULT HEARING |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed DEFAULT HEARING DEFAULT HEARING |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER RESETTING FINAL DEFAULT HEARING ORDER RESETTING FINAL DEFAULT HEARING |
|
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Undeliverable MATIAS GONZALEZ JR MATIAS GONZALEZ JR |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Returned Undeliverable MATIAS GONZALEZ JR MATIAS GONZALEZ JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.