Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Martinez Williams, Esperanza, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Gregorio R. Lopez, against Covarrubias, Aidee, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Alberto Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlberto Garcia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2020 |
CategoryJp Appeal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Returned Mail
Date: June 24, 2021Final Judgment, Signed
Date: May 28, 2021Notice Mailed
Date: October 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment, Signed MAILED TO DEF MAILED TO DEF |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Final Judgment Final Judgment |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED VIA ZOOM. Attorney Gregorio Lopez present with his client, Mrs. Esperanza Martinez Williams. Pro Se Litigant Aidee Covarrubias NOT PRESENT; her name was called out 3 times and there was no response. Court finds that proper notices went out to notify of today's hearing. Attorney Greg Lopez announced to the court the house has been emptied out since March, 2021. Case proved up by Attorney Greg Lopez. Seeking all missed recent payments in the amount of $7,150.00; Attorney Fees in the amount of $3,000.00; and Court Cost in the amount of $320.00. Judgment Granted for Plaintiff by Default, including Immediate Posession. Judgment to be efiled by Attorney Greg Lopez for Judge's signature. CASE CALLED VIA ZOOM. Attorney Gregorio Lopez present with his client, Mrs. Esperanza Martinez Williams. Pro Se Litigant Aidee Covarrubias NOT PRESENT; her name was called out 3 times and there was no response. Court finds that proper notices went out to notify of today's hearing. Attorney Greg Lopez announced to the court the house has been emptied out since March, 2021. Case proved up by Attorney Greg Lopez. Seeking all missed recent payments in the amount of $7,150.00; Attorney Fees in the amount of $3,000.00; and Court Cost in the amount of $320.00. Judgment Granted for Plaintiff by Default, including Immediate Posession. Judgment to be efiled by Attorney Greg Lopez for Judge's signature. |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Albert) on JP Appeal Result: Held on JP Appeal |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Appearance of Counsel Notice of Appearance of Counsel |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Phone Call from Esperanza Martinez Wiliams requesting additional time for Bench Trial to hire an Attorney. Case reset to May 21 at 10:00 a.m. for Bench Trial. from Esperanza Martinez Wiliams requesting additional time for Bench Trial to hire an Attorney. Case reset to May 21 at 10:00 a.m. for Bench Trial. |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Albert) Result: Passed | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Petitioner Esperanza Martinez Williams present via zoom and is requesting additional time to hire an attorney. Case set for April 9, 2021 at 10 a.m. Petitioner Esperanza Martinez Williams present via zoom and is requesting additional time to hire an attorney. Case set for April 9, 2021 at 10 a.m. |
|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (10:00 AM) () |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.