Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Blackbird Leasing, Inc., Garza, Eric, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Reynaldo Ortiz, against Key, Frank P, Palacios, Victor, represented by David Benjamin, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 04, 2020 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract (Oca) |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Other
Date: May 05, 2021Order, Signed
Date: January 14, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 06, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other 2021.05.05 DPB Vac Ltr 2021.05.05 DPB Vac Ltr Judge: Maldonado, Omar) Party(KEY, FRANK P |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Granting Frank P. Key, Indiv. and d/b/a Frank P. Key & Associates' Motion to Dismiss Order Granting Frank P. Key, Indiv. and d/b/a Frank P. Key & Associates' Motion to Dismiss Judge: Maldonado, Omar) Party(KEY, FRANK P |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue MTN DISMISS SENT TO COURT MTN DISMISS SENT TO COURT Judge: Maldonado, Omar) Party(KEY, FRANK P |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (9:30 AM) () Briefs to have been prepared Briefs to have been prepared Judge: Maldonado, Omar) Party(KEY, FRANK P |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Order Granting Frank P. Key, Indiv. and d/b/a Frank P. Key & Associates' Motion to Dismiss Order Granting Frank P. Key, Indiv. and d/b/a Frank P. Key & Associates' Motion to Dismiss |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue BRIEF BRIEF Judge: Maldonado, Omar) Party(KEY, FRANK P |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Brief Frank P. Key's Brief ISO Mtn to Dismiss Frank P. Key's Brief ISO Mtn to Dismiss Judge: Maldonado, Omar) Party(KEY, FRANK P |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Called Mr. Pierre made his arguments for a motion for dismiss. Mr. Pierre made his arguments for a motion for dismiss. Judge: Maldonado, Omar) Party(KEY, FRANK P |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Called Mr. Ortiz for plaintiff, Mr. Pierre for respondent present via zoom. Both parties made their arguments on respondents mtn to dismiss. mr. Pierre made his full arguments and filed brief. Mr. Ortiz to respond to Mr. Pierre within 14 days. Case reset to 01/13/20. Mr. Ortiz for plaintiff, Mr. Pierre for respondent present via zoom. Both parties made their arguments on respondents mtn to dismiss. mr. Pierre made his full arguments and filed brief. Mr. Ortiz to respond to Mr. Pierre within 14 days. Case reset to 01/13/20. Judge: Maldonado, Omar) Party(KEY, FRANK P |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion (9:30 AM) () Frank P. Key, individually and d/b/a Frank P. Key & Associates's Mtn to Dismiss Frank P. Key, individually and d/b/a Frank P. Key & Associates's Mtn to Dismiss Judge: Maldonado, Omar) Party(KEY, FRANK P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.