Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Chapa, Hector G., Coronado, Angel, Delgado, Francisco, Delgado, Maria, Delgado, Uriel, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Celeste Vasquez, Selvino Padilla, Jr., against Rada, Yhanira Ann, represented by C. Brandon Holubar, Oscar Alaniz, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 21, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel (10:00 AM) () VIA ZOOM HEARING - **Rule 11 Agreement to be efiled passing hearing** VIA ZOOM HEARING - **Rule 11 Agreement to be efiled passing hearing** |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement SENT TO COURT SENT TO COURT |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Rule 11 Agreement, efiled. Rule 11 Agreement, efiled. |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Court received telephone call from Samantha with the Chavez Legal Group that the parties have efiled a Rule 11 Agreement passing hearing of 1.13.21 at 10:00 a.m. Court received telephone call from Samantha with the Chavez Legal Group that the parties have efiled a Rule 11 Agreement passing hearing of 1.13.21 at 10:00 a.m. |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery signed and set for hrg. on 01/13/2021 @ 10:00 a.m. Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery signed and set for hrg. on 01/13/2021 @ 10:00 a.m. |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Will be Issued by the Court Clerk. Will be Issued by the Court Clerk. |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Proposed Order Proposed Order |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion (No Fee) Motion Motion (No Fee) |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed Notice of Counter Affidavits Notice of Counter Affidavits |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.