Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Canales, Raul J, Rosales Gonzalez, Ezequiel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Langdon Milton Smith, Iii, against Macias, Sebastian S, Ms Transportation, Llc, represented by Douglas E. Chaves, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRose Guerra Reyna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order Of Dismissal |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: September 20, 2021Reporter's Certification of Deposition
Date: September 01, 2021Notice of Delivery
Date: April 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Delivery EMPLOYMENT AND PAYROLL REQUESTED FROM TRI-RECYCLING, INC EMPLOYMENT AND PAYROLL REQUESTED FROM TRI-RECYCLING, INC Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition AURELIO GUTIERREZ AURELIO GUTIERREZ Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) (5 days) (5 days) |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler Case Disposed CANCELED Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE 08/24/2021 Reset by Court to 08/31/2021 08/31/2021 Reset by Court to 09/07/2021 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition CAROLE DEVOS CAROLE DEVOS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification of Deposition CHARLES W. KENNEDY JR., MD CHARLES W. KENNEDY JR., MD Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid AGREED ORDER - PARTY INCURRED AGREED ORDER - PARTY INCURRED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal, Signed AGREED OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AGREED OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.