Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Toribio Terry Palacios, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRose Guerra Reyna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Order, Signed
Date: January 13, 2021Court Entries
Date: January 13, 2021Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) COMPLIANCE OF CONDITIONS OF BOND COMPLIANCE OF CONDITIONS OF BOND |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Case called for Status Conference; Deft. present w/atty. ____________; Attys. Joaquin Zamora/Danica Carman present via zoom; CO Juan Arellano present; Deft has not been indicted; There are no violations on the conditions of bond; AIP officer to notify the court if there is any violations while on AIP. Case called for Status Conference; Deft. present w/atty. ____________; Attys. Joaquin Zamora/Danica Carman present via zoom; CO Juan Arellano present; Deft has not been indicted; There are no violations on the conditions of bond; AIP officer to notify the court if there is any violations while on AIP. |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 2/26/21 Email sent to attorneys with link to appear via Zoom on 2/26/21 |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Alternative Incarceration Program, Signed | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ALTERNATIVE INCARCERATION PROGRAM; SENT TO D/C QUEUE ALTERNATIVE INCARCERATION PROGRAM; SENT TO D/C QUEUE |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING; DEFENDANT PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. TERRY PALACIOS VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JOAQUIN ZAMORA PRESENT VIA ZOOM; AIP CONTRACT IS TO BE FILED TODAY; DEFT DID INSTALL THE PORTABLE DEVICE; THE COURT WILL NOT SIGN A RELEASE ORDER UNLESS A SIGNED AIP CONTRACT IS SIGNED BY THE COURT; THE CASE HAS BEEN NOT SUBMITTED TO THE D.A.'S OFFICE; THE COURT SET STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING (COMPLIANCE OF CONDITIONS OF BOND) FOR 2/26/21 AT 8:30 A.M.; NOTICE GIVEN IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO GO OUT. CASE CALLED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING; DEFENDANT PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. TERRY PALACIOS VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JOAQUIN ZAMORA PRESENT VIA ZOOM; AIP CONTRACT IS TO BE FILED TODAY; DEFT DID INSTALL THE PORTABLE DEVICE; THE COURT WILL NOT SIGN A RELEASE ORDER UNLESS A SIGNED AIP CONTRACT IS SIGNED BY THE COURT; THE CASE HAS BEEN NOT SUBMITTED TO THE D.A.'S OFFICE; THE COURT SET STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING (COMPLIANCE OF CONDITIONS OF BOND) FOR 2/26/21 AT 8:30 A.M.; NOTICE GIVEN IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO GO OUT. |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ALTERNATIVE INCARCERATION PROGRAM ALTERNATIVE INCARCERATION PROGRAM |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) COMPLIANCE OF CONDITIONS OF BOND COMPLIANCE OF CONDITIONS OF BOND |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ALTERNATIVE INCARCERATION PROGRAM ALTERNATIVE INCARCERATION PROGRAM |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Order Modifying Conditions Of Bond,Signed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.