Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Melisandra Mendoza, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Mancias, Fernando G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMancias, Fernando G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Order to Transfer Case, Signed
Date: September 03, 2021Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: September 07, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 07, 2021Notice Sent
Date: September 03, 2021Order of Release, Signed
Date: September 07, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: September 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF RELEASE ORDER OF RELEASE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER OF RELEASE ORDER OF RELEASE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Release, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G)
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER OF RELEASE ORDER OF RELEASE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Transfer Case, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ORDER SETTING HEARING Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.