Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Ruben J. Luna, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Fernando G. Mancias presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFernando G. Mancias Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: September 15, 2021Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: September 09, 2021Order of Release, Signed
Date: September 08, 2021Alternative Incarceration Program, Signed
Date: September 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: September 08, 2021Notice Sent
Date: August 27, 2021Writ Issued
Date: August 27, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: August 26, 2021Proposed Order
Date: August 26, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: August 26, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: August 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF RELEASE ORDER OF RELEASE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Alternative Incarceration Program, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Release, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER OF RELEASE ORDER OF RELEASE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER OF RELEASE ORDER OF RELEASE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G)
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.