Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gutierrez Hernandez, Eduardo, Jimenez Sanabia, Jose Alfredo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mario Davila, against 100% Antojitos Mexicanos, Inc., Bautista, Kevin, Mendez, Ruben Alejandro, represented by Alexander J. Tiffany, Liza M. Vasquez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: July 29, 2022Court Entries
Date: July 26, 2022Notice of Non-Suit, Filed
Date: July 29, 2022Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed
Date: July 29, 2022Amended Answer
Date: April 08, 2022Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: April 01, 2022Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: April 01, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: February 07, 2022Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Motion to Dismiss, Filed
Date: March 31, 2022Notice of Filing of Medical Records
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Filing, Filed
Date: January 21, 2022Docket Control Order, Signed
Date: January 13, 2022Notice Sent
Date: November 23, 2021Notice Sent
Date: January 13, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: December 10, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: October 29, 2021Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: November 15, 2021Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: November 23, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 27, 2021Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: October 28, 2021Notice
Date: September 27, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 23, 2021Citation Issued
Date: August 31, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 24, 2021Citation Issued
Date: August 25, 2021Request for Service
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial on Merits (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent PLAINTIFFS' ORDER NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS PLAINTIFFS' ORDER NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit, Filed WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT KEVIN BAUTISTA WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT KEVIN BAUTISTA Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Partial Non-Suit, Signed WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue PLAINTIFFS' ORDER NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS PLAINTIFFS' ORDER NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed PLAINTIFFS' ORDER NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS; SENT TO D/C QUEUE PLAINTIFFS' ORDER NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS; SENT TO D/C QUEUE Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS NONSUIT WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.)
Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR FIRST P/T; ATTY. LIZA VASQUEZ PRESENT; NOTHING TO PRETRY CASE CALLED FOR FIRST P/T; ATTY. LIZA VASQUEZ PRESENT; NOTHING TO PRETRY Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Party(Bautista, Kevin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.