Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Alejandro, Joel Luna, De Alejandro, Guadalupe Almaguer, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fidel Luis, Iii Pena, against Coj Tire And Service, Llc, Gutierrez, Fernando, represented by Carla M. Saenz, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRose Guerra Reyna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
This complaint is a Plaintiffs Original Petition filed by Joel Luna Alejandro and Guadalupe Almaguer de Alejandro against Fernando Gutierrez and COJ Tire and Service, LLC. The plaintiffs allege that they sustained injuries and damages as a result of ...
Motion for Default Judgment
Date: September 29, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 20, 2021Citation Issued
Date: September 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing Other CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
First Pretrial Other CANCELED First Pretrial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent ORDER GRANTING INTERVENORS MOTION FOR NON-SUIT OF PLEA IN INTERVENTIO ORDER GRANTING INTERVENORS MOTION FOR NON-SUIT OF PLEA IN INTERVENTIO Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Defendant s Motion to Dismiss Intervention for Lack of Jurisdiction (filed 2/20/24) Defendant s Motion to Dismiss Intervention for Lack of Jurisdiction (filed 2/20/24) Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal, Signed INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Sustaining Motion to Dismiss Intervention for Lack of Jurisdiction - sent to DC queue on 3/7/24 Order Sustaining Motion to Dismiss Intervention for Lack of Jurisdiction - sent to DC queue on 3/7/24 Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR 1.INTERVENOR'S PLEA IN INTERVENTION AND TO DETERMINE IF COURT HAS AUTHORITY 2. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; ATTY JR. GARZA PRESENT; ATTY FRANK GARZA NOT PRESENT; THE COURT GRANTED DEF. MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; ORDER TO BE SIGNED. CASE CALLED FOR 1.INTERVENOR'S PLEA IN INTERVENTION AND TO DETERMINE IF COURT HAS AUTHORITY 2. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; ATTY JR. GARZA PRESENT; ATTY FRANK GARZA NOT PRESENT; THE COURT GRANTED DEF. MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; ORDER TO BE SIGNED. Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue - Requested by Court ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION Judge: Reyna, Rose G.) Comment (ORDER SUSTAINING MOTION TO DISMISS INTERVENTION FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.