Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Juan A. Tijerina, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRose Guerra Reyna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment Signed |
Order Signed
Date: October 04, 2021Court Entries
Date: September 30, 2021Court Entries
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler Case Disposed CANCELED Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed CLERKS TO DISPOSE CASE Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Signed ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS TO REDUCE BOND ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS TO REDUCE BOND Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - SENT TO DC ON 10/5/21 ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS - SENT TO DC ON 10/5/21 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DEFT PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JUAN TIJERINA VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JOAQUIN ZAMORA/DANICA CARMAN PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CO JUAN ARELLANO PRESENT VIA ZOOM; THE COURT KEPT AT THE CURRENT AMOUNT; IF THERE IS NO FURTHER PRECEDENT IN THE NEXT 30 DAYS, COUNSEL IS TO ADVISE THE COURT TO RESET. CASE CALLED FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DEFT PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JUAN TIJERINA VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JOAQUIN ZAMORA/DANICA CARMAN PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CO JUAN ARELLANO PRESENT VIA ZOOM; THE COURT KEPT AT THE CURRENT AMOUNT; IF THERE IS NO FURTHER PRECEDENT IN THE NEXT 30 DAYS, COUNSEL IS TO ADVISE THE COURT TO RESET. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) SO 394189 **JAIL** SO 394189 **JAIL** Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 10/4/21 Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 10/4/21 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) SO#394189 **JAIL** SO#394189 **JAIL** Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries CASE CALLED FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DEFT WAS NOT BROUGHT DUE TO MEDICAL ISSUES; ATTY. JUAN TIJERINA PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JOAQUIN ZAMORA/DANICA CARMEN PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CO JUAN ARELLANO PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CASE RESET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR 10/4/21 AT 8:00 A.M.; NOTICE GIVEN IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO GO OUT. CASE CALLED FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DEFT WAS NOT BROUGHT DUE TO MEDICAL ISSUES; ATTY. JUAN TIJERINA PRESENT VIA ZOOM; ATTY. JOAQUIN ZAMORA/DANICA CARMEN PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CO JUAN ARELLANO PRESENT VIA ZOOM; CASE RESET FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR 10/4/21 AT 8:00 A.M.; NOTICE GIVEN IN OPEN COURT; NO FURTHER NOTICE TO GO OUT. Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 9/1/21 Email sent to attorney(s) with link to appear via Zoom on 9/1/21 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.