Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lira, Adrian A., filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by J. Michael Moore, against Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, represented by Rosemary Conrad Sandoval, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryCprc Chapter 12 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: June 28, 2022Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: February 22, 2022Defendant's Original Answer
Date: September 17, 2021Citation Issued
Date: August 23, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer SPECIFIC AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND SPECIFIC AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND JURY DEMAND |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation Issued |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation By Certified Mail ALLSTATE VEHICLE AND PROPERTY INSURANCE COMPANY Unserved | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) AND NOTICE OF REQUIRED DISCLOSURES AND NOTICE OF REQUIRED DISCLOSURES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.