Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mendoza, Anna, Mendoza, Henry, filed a(n) Mdl-21-0268 case represented by J. Michael Moore, against Allstate Texas Lloyds, represented by John Michael Flores Eisenmenger, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Leticia Lopez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeticia Lopez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryMdl-21-0268 |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice Signed |
Order Granting Dismissal Without Prejudice, Signed
Date: June 15, 2022Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: June 16, 2022Amended
Date: March 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Dismissal Without Prejudice, Signed
Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss, Filed MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed ORDER ON AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. CLERK TO ISSUE.CD ORDER ON AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY JUDGE LETTY LOPEZ. CLERK TO ISSUE.CD Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER ON AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ORDER ON AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ORDER ON AGREED MOTION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediator's Report CASE SETTLED CASE SETTLED Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED ORIGINAL PETITION Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 IN MDL-21-0268 CASE AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 IN MDL-21-0268 CASE Judge: Lopez, Letty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.