Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by William H. Mcpherson, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRose Guerra Reyna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: July 01, 2021Order, Signed
Date: July 01, 2021Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: June 30, 2021Notice Sent
Date: June 28, 2021Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: June 30, 2021Court Entries
Date: June 29, 2021Writ Issued
Date: June 28, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 28, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: June 25, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: June 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler Case Disposed CANCELED Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed ORDER IN COMMITMENT TO BE SIGNED, AGREED ORDER TO BE FILED Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) ORDER IN COMMITMENT TO BE SIGNED, AGREED ORDER TO BE FILED ORDER IN COMMITMENT TO BE SIGNED, AGREED ORDER TO BE FILED |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed COURT ORDER COURT ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed COURT ORDER - SENT TO DISTRICT CLERK ON 7/2/21 COURT ORDER - SENT TO DISTRICT CLERK ON 7/2/21 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order COURT ORDER COURT ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue COURT ORDER COURT ORDER Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed SENT TO DISTRICT CLERK ON 7/2/21 SENT TO DISTRICT CLERK ON 7/2/21 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Served
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.