Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by John J. Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Israel Ramon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsrael Ramon, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: July 09, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Date: July 08, 2021Notice Sent
Date: July 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed John J. Rodriguez - $205.00 John J. Rodriguez - $205.00 Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND BOND REDUCTION ORDER ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND BOND REDUCTION Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF COMMITMENT ORDER OF COMMITMENT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called C/R Cindi Cavazos; Bond Reduced. C/R Cindi Cavazos; Bond Reduced. Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Reducing Bond, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.