Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by John J. Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: June 30, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 23, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called ADA Michelle Puig & Anthony Ortega P; Def. Atty. Jorge Ortegon & Def. P; case to be sent to the 370th to be assigned to a court. ADA Michelle Puig & Anthony Ortega P; Def. Atty. Jorge Ortegon & Def. P; case to be sent to the 370th to be assigned to a court. Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") JAIL, JAIL, JAIL JAIL, JAIL, JAIL Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEE FORM ATTORNEY FEE FORM Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno")
Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called zoom hearing, all parties present, bond granted zoom hearing, all parties present, bond granted Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER SETTING HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Vasquez, L. "Keno") Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.