Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Daniel R. Reyes, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Israel Ramon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsrael Ramon, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeOther |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: July 26, 2021Proposed Order
Date: July 01, 2021Notice Sent
Date: July 02, 2021Order Reducing Bond, Signed
Date: July 01, 2021Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: July 02, 2021Order of Commitment, Signed
Date: July 01, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: June 24, 2021Notice Sent
Date: June 25, 2021Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 24, 2021Writ Issued
Date: June 25, 2021Order of Transfer
Date: June 24, 2021Order of Transfer
Date: June 24, 2021Proposed Order
Date: June 23, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: June 23, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed Daniel R. Reyes - $380.00 Daniel R. Reyes - $380.00 Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEE EXPENSE FORM ATTORNEY FEE EXPENSE FORM Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER REDUCING BOND ORDER REDUCING BOND Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF COMMITMENT ORDER OF COMMITMENT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order OF COMMITMENT OF COMMITMENT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Reducing Bond, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Comment (ORDER OF COMMITMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.