Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Sergio J. Sanchez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Marla Cuellar presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarla Cuellar Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Proposed Order
Date: June 23, 2021Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Case called via ZOOM. ADAs Ben Alonzo and Juan Arevalo appeared via ZOOM for the State. Atty. Sergio Sanchez did NOT appear. The Defendant appeared via ZOOM in custody. The Court denied the Defendant's writ and request for bond reduction. CSR=TRN Case called via ZOOM. ADAs Ben Alonzo and Juan Arevalo appeared via ZOOM for the State. Atty. Sergio Sanchez did NOT appear. The Defendant appeared via ZOOM in custody. The Court denied the Defendant's writ and request for bond reduction. CSR=TRN |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing, Signed | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ MONTEMAYOR, LEONARDO DELFINO Served 07/07/2021 Returned 07/08/2021 | |
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) Result: No Appearance | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS Order Setting Hearing ORDER SETTING HEARING ON WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.