Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Orlando Esquivel, against Luna, Jovan Dontrell, represented by Surya Mangi, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Luis M. Singleterry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLuis M. Singleterry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2021 |
CategoryFugitive Warrant |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: September 07, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing Other CANCELED Status Conference Hearing (11:00 AM) () Other 30 DAY FUGITIVE STATUS |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (11:00 AM) () 30 DAY FUGITIVE STATUS 30 DAY FUGITIVE STATUS |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Phone Call LEFT V/M TO LAWFIRM-DEF RELASED-HRG CANCELED FOR 7/26/21 LEFT V/M TO LAWFIRM-DEF RELASED-HRG CANCELED FOR 7/26/21 |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed $415.00 SUBMITTED BY SURYA MANGI. LB $415.00 SUBMITTED BY SURYA MANGI. LB |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order WAIVER OF EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS WAIVER OF EXTRADITION PROCEEDINGS |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Extradition Proceedings, Signed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.