Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Daniel Mora, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Librado Keno Vasquez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLibrado Keno Vasquez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: November 18, 2022Order to Transfer Case, Signed
Date: June 30, 2021Writ Issued
Date: June 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed Dan Mora - $157.50 Dan Mora - $157.50 |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue FWD TO THE 430TH FOR SECOND SIGNATURE FWD TO THE 430TH FOR SECOND SIGNATURE |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Transfer Case, Signed | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called zoom hearing, all parties present, case to be transfer to 430th zoom hearing, all parties present, case to be transfer to 430th |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Habeas Corpus (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR BOND REDUCTION ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR BOND REDUCTION |
|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ ALANIZ, ERNESTO, III Served 06/25/2021 Returned 06/28/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.