Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Trevino, Eduvina G, Trevino, Homero, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Perry J. Dominguez, Ii, against Allstate Vehicle And Property Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Plaintiff |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: March 04, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 04, 2022Motion to Dismiss, Filed
Date: March 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order GRANTING AGREED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE GRANTING AGREED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss, Filed AGREED WITH PREJUDICE AGREED WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER GRANTING AGREED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ORDER GRANTING AGREED DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate 18906 HOMERO TREVINO R 18906 HOMERO TREVINO R Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate 18906 EDUVINA TREVINO R 18906 EDUVINA TREVINO R Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery
Judge: Flores, Bobby |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing, Filed RULE 11 AGREEMENT RULE 11 AGREEMENT Judge: Flores, Bobby |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.