Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Sergio J. Sanchez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Israel Ramon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsrael Ramon, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 17, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: June 23, 2021Writ Issued
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) NONSUIT NONSUIT |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ON BAIL REDUCTION AND RELEASE FOR LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON BAIL REDUCTION AND RELEASE FOR LACK OF PROBABLE CAUSE |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Entries Returned Order on D's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed 6/16/21 to Clerk. Order NOT signed. No longer needed. Parties will file Nonsuit. Returned Order on D's Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed 6/16/21 to Clerk. Order NOT signed. No longer needed. Parties will file Nonsuit. |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ of Habeas Corpus Other CANCELED Writ of Habeas Corpus (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Ramon, Israel, Jr.) Other |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Writ Issued |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ LAZO, XAVIER HERNANDEZ Returned Unserved 06/23/2021 Returned 06/23/2021 | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed Writ of Habeas Corpus Writ of Habeas Corpus |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.