Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Orlando Esquivel, against Avalos, Octavio, represented by Christopher Paul Cavazos, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Marla Cuellar presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarla Cuellar Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryFugitive Warrant |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Proposed Order
Date: June 25, 2021Proposed Order
Date: July 28, 2021Order Returned by Court
Date: August 20, 2021DWOP Notice Sent
Date: October 02, 2023Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: October 05, 2021Waiver of Extradition Proceedings, Signed
Date: June 28, 2021Fugitive Warrant (OCA)
Date: June 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Cuellar, Marla) | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DWOP Notice Sent | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE 92ND QUEUE ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE 92ND QUEUE |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing Other CANCELED Status Conference Hearing (11:00 AM) () Other 30 DAY FUGITIVE STATUS |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference Hearing (11:00 AM) () 30 DAY FUGITIVE STATUS 30 DAY FUGITIVE STATUS |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Phone Call TO LAWOFFICE-NOTIFIED DEF HAS BEEN RELEASED TO ANOTHER AGENCY-NO FURTHER HRGS TO LAWOFFICE-NOTIFIED DEF HAS BEEN RELEASED TO ANOTHER AGENCY-NO FURTHER HRGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.