Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Casares, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Adolfo Alvarez, Jr., Hector Bustos, against Ali, Mohamoud, Kal Freight, Inc., Pro Tec Inc., represented by Heidi L. Williams, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Singleterry, Luis M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSingleterry, Luis M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Motion to Withdraw Funds, Filed
Date: October 27, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: October 31, 2022Proposed Order
Date: October 27, 2022Order Returned by Court
Date: October 31, 2022Motion to Withdraw Funds, Filed
Date: October 27, 2022Proposed Order
Date: October 27, 2022Order Signed
Date: July 22, 2022Notice Sent
Date: July 22, 2022Notice Sent
Date: June 20, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: June 20, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: June 13, 2022Court Costs Paid
Date: March 23, 2022Final Judgment, Signed
Date: March 16, 2022Notice Sent
Date: January 31, 2022Proposed Order
Date: March 15, 2022Notice Sent
Date: November 10, 2021Order Re-Setting Hearing
Date: November 10, 2021Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: November 10, 2021Notice Sent
Date: November 10, 2021Order Re-Setting Hearing
Date: January 26, 2022Order Resetting Hearing Date, Signed
Date: January 31, 2022Order Setting Hearing, Signed
Date: November 10, 2021Order Setting Hearing
Date: November 08, 2021Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem
Date: June 15, 2021Notice Sent
Date: June 15, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: June 14, 2021Original Petition (OCA)
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (ESTRELLA RAMIREZ) ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (ESTRELLA RAMIREZ) Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (MAGDALENO RAMIREZ) ( VH - NO PROVE OF AGE COMPLIANCE REJECTED BY COURT) ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (MAGDALENO RAMIREZ) ( VH - NO PROVE OF AGE COMPLIANCE REJECTED BY COURT) Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (ESTRELLA RAMIREZ) ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (ESTRELLA RAMIREZ) Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (MAGDALENO RAMIREZ) ORDER ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (MAGDALENO RAMIREZ) Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Funds, Filed IN THE COURT REGISTRY (ESTRELLA RAMIREZ) IN THE COURT REGISTRY (ESTRELLA RAMIREZ) Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (MAGDALENO RAMIREZ) ORDER ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (MAGDALENO RAMIREZ) Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Funds, Filed IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (ESTRELLA RAMIREZ) ON PLANTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAWA FUNDS IN THE COURT'S REGISTRY (ESTRELLA RAMIREZ) Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Signed TO RELEASE FUNDS TO RELEASE FUNDS Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
|
July 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS Judge: Singleterry, Luis M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.