Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Rubio Salinas, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Rose Guerra Reyna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRose Guerra Reyna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus (OCA)
Date: June 11, 2021Notice Sent
Date: June 25, 2021Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Date: July 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Tickler Case Disposed CANCELED Tickler (5:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Case Disposed Clerk to close file Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probable Cause Hearing Other CANCELED Probable Cause Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) Other JAIL JAIL SO 499083 (ENGLISH) Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probable Cause Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Reyna, Rose G.) JAIL JAIL SO 499083 (ENGLISH) JAIL JAIL SO 499083 (ENGLISH) |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit, Signed
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order, Signed Order Granting Nonsuit - sent to DC queue on 7/26/21 Order Granting Nonsuit - sent to DC queue on 7/26/21 Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Non-Suit
Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT ORDER GRANTING NONSUIT Judge: Reyna, Rose G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.