Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, The State Of Texas--Atty General, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Lauro B. Trejo, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Mancias, Fernando G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMancias, Fernando G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: June 16, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: July 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Called COURT REPORTER: Esther Natividad. Appearing were Attys. Lauro Trejo (in person), Juan Bazan, Michelle Beltran, Probation Officer Pete Zuniga. Defendant is to be kept in AIP. COURT REPORTER: Esther Natividad. Appearing were Attys. Lauro Trejo (in person), Juan Bazan, Michelle Beltran, Probation Officer Pete Zuniga. Defendant is to be kept in AIP. Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Mancias, Fernando G) ON AIP VIOLATIONS ON AIP VIOLATIONS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM FORM Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF RELEASE ORDER OF RELEASE Judge: Mancias, Fernando G |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.