Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Rogelio Garza, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Israel Ramon, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsrael Ramon, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment After Non-Jury Trial |
Notice Sent to HCSO
Date: June 17, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed
Date: July 07, 2021Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Date: July 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed ROGELIO GARZA - $240.00 ROGELIO GARZA - $240.00 Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Signed Rogelio Garza - $240.00 Rogelio Garza - $240.00 Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM ATTORNEY FEES EXPENSE CLAIM Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Attorney Fees Expense Claim, Filed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Court Cost Waived HABEAS CORPUS HABEAS CORPUS Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent to HCSO ORDER OF COMMITMENT ORDER OF COMMITMENT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Commitment, Signed
Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order OF COMMITMENT OF COMMITMENT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Called C/R Velma Arellano; Agr bond reduction granted. C/R Velma Arellano; Agr bond reduction granted. Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue ORDER OF COMMITMENT ORDER OF COMMITMENT Judge: Ramon, Israel, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.