Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Tamez, Daniel, Tamez, Gloria A, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by J. Michael Moore, against Homesite Insurance Company, represented by Steven F. Hudgins, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Leticia Lopez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeticia Lopez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryCprc Chapter 12 |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice Signed |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Date: July 19, 2023Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Date: July 19, 2023Court Costs Paid
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) Other TWO - THREE DAYS Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) TWO - THREE DAYS TWO - THREE DAYS |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Hearing Other CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) Other Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tickler Case Disposed CANCELED Tickler (6:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) Case Disposed CHECK DISP Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Costs Paid PARTY INCURRED PARTY INCURRED Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal with Prejudice, Signed
Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rule 306 Sent
Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Signed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice signed by Judge Letty Lopez. Clerk to issue. DP Order of Dismissal with Prejudice signed by Judge Letty Lopez. Clerk to issue. DP Judge: Lopez, Letty |
|
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss, Filed
Judge: Lopez, Letty |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.