Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
M.A. Ruiz Law Firm, filed a(n) All Other Civil Cases (Oca) case represented by Miguel Angel Ruiz, against Olivarez, Lazaro G., Jr., represented by Fela B. Olivarez, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Noe Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNoe Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2019 |
CategoryAll Other Civil Cases (Oca) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
|
Order Setting DCC, Signed
Date: June 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: May 10, 2021Amended Answer
Date: April 29, 2021Order of the Court, Signed
Date: April 12, 2021Proposed Order
Date: April 09, 2021Proposed Order
Date: January 13, 2021Response
Date: January 13, 2021Reply
Date: January 12, 2021Proposed Order
Date: January 04, 2021Proposed Order
Date: January 04, 2021Motion
Date: January 04, 2021Amended Answer
Date: January 04, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: December 30, 2020Proposed Order
Date: November 25, 2020Order Signed
Date: June 29, 2020Order of Transfer
Date: November 18, 2020Proposed Order
Date: January 15, 2020Motion for Continuance, Filed
Date: November 20, 2019Proposed Order
Date: November 20, 2019Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Order of Severance Signed (OCA)
Date: August 06, 2019Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Filed
Date: June 19, 2019Rule 11 Agreement, Filed
Date: January 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Noe) | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting DCC, Signed | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER SETTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER SETTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER SETTING DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE |
|
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Docket Control Conference, Filed | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order FINAL JDUGMENT ON SUIT FOR SWORN ACCOUNT FINAL JDUGMENT ON SUIT FOR SWORN ACCOUNT |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court FINAL JUDGMENT ON SUIT FOR SWORN ACCOUNT FINAL JUDGMENT ON SUIT FOR SWORN ACCOUNT |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court FINAL JUDGMEN ON SUIT FOR SWORN ACCOUNT REJECTED DUE TO: RULING PENDING; LMK FINAL JUDGMEN ON SUIT FOR SWORN ACCOUNT REJECTED DUE TO: RULING PENDING; LMK |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
E-Filing Forwarded to Court Queue FINAL JUDGMENT ON SUIT FOR SWORN ACCOUNT FINAL JUDGMENT ON SUIT FOR SWORN ACCOUNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.