Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Espinoza, Wendy, Martinez, Miguel Angel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Adam J Flood, against Castro, Eduardo Alain, represented by Eric Michael Garza, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Leticia Lopez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeticia Lopez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2020 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Citation Issued
Date: February 20, 2020Request
Date: June 23, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: February 19, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT AGREED FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Friendly Suit (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) Result: Held | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Friendly Suit (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed RE-SETING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM RE-SETING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER RE-SETING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM ORDER RE-SETING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing, Signed ON FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING AND SET FOR 10/24/23@ 9:45 A.M. CLERK TO ISSUE.CD ON FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING AND SET FOR 10/24/23@ 9:45 A.M. CLERK TO ISSUE.CD |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Returned by Court ORDER RE-SETING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM ORDER RE-SETING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Friendly Suit Other CANCELED Friendly Suit (9:45 AM) (Judicial Officer Lopez, Letty) Other |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Re-Setting Hearing FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Sent to Workflow Queue ORDER RE-SETING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM ORDER RE-SETING FRIENDLY SUIT HEARING VIA ZOOM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.