Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gonzalez, Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael James, against Baccaro, Ronnie Lee, represented by Alexandra Habbouche-Huerta, Christina Iliana Saldivar, in the jurisdiction of Hidalgo County, TX, . Hidalgo County, TX Superior Courts with Librado Keno Vasquez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLibrado Keno Vasquez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2018 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle (Oca) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHidalgo County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Notice of Appearance, Filed
Date: September 25, 2023Notice Sent
Date: February 24, 2023Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys
Date: June 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Preferential Trial (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance, Filed | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Vacation Letter Filed by Attorneys | |
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Conference with cesar chapa and carol w/ atty alexandra huerta fpt-11/16/.23 @ 10:00 a.m. t/m-11/27/23 @ 8:00 a.m. with cesar chapa and carol w/ atty alexandra huerta fpt-11/16/.23 @ 10:00 a.m. t/m-11/27/23 @ 8:00 a.m. |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference Hearing/Telephonic (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Other CANCELED Jury Trial (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") Other |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Vasquez, L. "Keno") | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent ORDER SETTIING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE ORDER SETTIING TELEPHONIC DOCKET CONTROL CONFERENCE |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting DCC, Signed TELEPHONIC TELEPHONIC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.