Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Macey Family Properties Ltd, Macey Interests Lp, filed a(n) Tax Appraisal - Tax case represented by Cox, Ray L. Jr., against Harris County Appraisal District, represented by Mccarthy, Diane Kristen, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 270th with DEDRA DAVIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEDRA DAVIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryTax Appraisal |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeTax Appraisal |
Filing Court House270th |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
July 18, 2022 |
DOCKET CALL (MOTION FOR) Trial Coordinators Docket |
||
August 04, 2021 | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
August 03, 2021 | DESIGNATED TRIAL READY | ||
July 21, 2021 | ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition | |
June 30, 2021 | ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Request For Issuance Of Service | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.