Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
C.R And W.R., Minors, Carlos Ramos & Marta Quintanilla As Next Friends, Quintanilla, Marta, Ramos, Carlos, Ramos, Carlos Sr, R, C, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by O'Neil, Daniel Lee, against Houston Grass & Landscaping Services, Juan Manuel Ruiz-Sanchez D B A Houston Grass & Lan, Ramirez, Remedios, Ruiz-Sanchez, Juan Manuel, represented by O'Neil, Daniel Lee, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 011th with KRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKRISTEN BRAUCHLE HAWKINS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House011th |
ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED
Date: July 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 |
STATUS CONFERENCE (MOTION FOR) Law Day Docket |
||
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Return Notice of Activity | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Telephonic Status Conference | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance of Guardian Ad Litem. | |
July 14, 2021 | ORDER TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM GRANTED (Temporary Order) | ||
July 14, 2021 | SENSITIVE DATA INCLUDED IN DOCUMENT(Temporary Order) | ||
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | SENSITIVE DATA INCLUDED IN DOCUMENT | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED | |
July 13, 2021 | ORDER TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GRANTED (Temporary Order) | ||
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Juan Manuel Ruiz Sanchez DBA Houston Grass and Landscaping Services and Remedios Ramirez's Consolidated Original Answer. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.