Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sanchez, Mario, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Robertson, Charles Brannon, against Luxe Operating Llc, Nabors Industries Inc, represented by Browning, Robert Myrick, Hartmann, Kelly Clinton, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 157th with TANYA GARRISON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTANYA GARRISON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryPersonal Inj (Non-Auto) |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court House157th |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: June 30, 2021Nabors' Original Answer
Date: August 16, 2021Defendant's Luxe Operating, LLCs Original Answer
Date: July 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2021 | FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Nabors Industries Inc' First Amended Answer and Verified Denial | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Nabors' Original Answer | |
August 16, 2021 | ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Luxe Operating, LLCs Original Answer | |
July 23, 2021 | ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition | |
June 30, 2021 | ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
June 30, 2021 | JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.