Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Velasquez, Guadalupe Becerra(Individually And As Next Friend Of, Vxxxxxxxx, Nxxxxx Nxxxxx, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stano, Matthew, against Williams, Meyaconnie Mecoshay, represented by Jackson, William Steven, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 113th with RABEEA COLLIER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRABEEA COLLIER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House113th |
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: August 13, 2021Defendant's Original Answer
Date: August 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2022 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL ORDER | |
August 12, 2021 | DESIGNATED TRIAL READY | ||
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Original Answer | |
August 02, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
August 02, 2021 | JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216) | ||
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Jury Trial | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
June 30, 2021 | JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216) | ||
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition, Jury Demand, And Rule 193.7 Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.