Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company As Trustee For New Century Home, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Burns, Michael John, against Nichols, Scottie, Nichols, Scottie (In Rem Only And Only In His Capacity As Heir At Law, Walker, Viola Davis, Walker, Viola Davis (In Rem Only And Only In Her Capacity As Heir At, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 281st with ELAINE H PALMER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeELAINE H PALMER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court House281st |
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED
Date: July 05, 2021Proposed Order Allowing Citation By Publication
Date: July 07, 2021Plaintiff's Original Petition
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Return Mail Undeliverable | |
July 09, 2021 | ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE SIGNED | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Allowing Citation By Publication | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion For Citation By Publication | |
July 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED | |
July 05, 2021 | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
July 05, 2021 | TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT | ||
July 05, 2021 | TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT | ||
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit P-04 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.