Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Estate Of Chu Morse, Morse, Annie, Morse, Danny, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ramsey, John Christopher, against Sibrian, Nubia, Top Sushi, Top Sushi Llc, represented by O'Dea, Jeffry Paul, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 152nd with ROBERT K. SCHAFFER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERT K. SCHAFFER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House152nd |
Proposed Order Overruling Defendant Top Sushi, LLC D/b/a Top Sushi's Special Exceptions
Date: August 12, 2021DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: August 17, 2021Plaintiffs First Amended Petition
Date: August 12, 2021Order
Date: July 23, 2021Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: June 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2022 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Transcript Order Form and Waiver of Notice | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED | |
August 17, 2021 | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
August 13, 2021 | DESIGNATED TRIAL READY | ||
August 13, 2021 |
SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 91) Law Day Docket PER OPPSSING COUNSEL IN O/CRT F |
||
August 13, 2021 |
SPECIAL EXCEPTIONS (MOTION FOR) (TRCP 91) Law Day Docket |
||
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Danny Morse, Individually and on Behalf of the Estate of Chu Morse, and Annie Morse's Response in Opposition to Defendant Top Sushi, LLC D/B/A Top Sushi's Special Exceptions | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Overruling Defendant Top Sushi, LLC D/b/a Top Sushi's Special Exceptions | |
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs First Amended Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.