Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
America'S Choice Home Loans Lp, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Klasing, Murphy S., against Scurlock, Mary Eyvonne, represented by Portz, Charles H. Iii, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 011th with ROBERT K. SCHAFFER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERT K. SCHAFFER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House011th |
Americas Choice Home Loans, LPs Original Petition
Date: June 30, 2021DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED
Date: August 17, 2021ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2022 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED | |
August 17, 2021 | DOCKET CONTROL/PRETRIAL ORDER SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
August 13, 2021 | DESIGNATED TRIAL READY | ||
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendants Original Answer | |
July 19, 2021 | ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED | |
July 01, 2021 | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
July 01, 2021 | TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT | ||
July 01, 2021 | TRANSFERRED TO HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.