Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Excargo Services Inc, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Wagner, Brett E, against Olinde, Lance, Ramey Chandler Quinn & Zito P C, represented by Mccabe, Robert C., in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 190th with BEAU MILLER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBEAU MILLER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryMalpractice/Legal |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court House190th |
Plaintiffs Original Petition
Date: June 11, 2021DOCKET CONTROL ORDER
Date: July 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2022 |
TRIAL ON MERITS (MOTION FOR) Trial Setting |
||
July 16, 2021 | DESIGNATED TRIAL READY | ||
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | DOCKET CONTROL ORDER | |
July 12, 2021 | ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendants Ramey Chandler Quinn and Zito PC and Lance Olinde's Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Petition | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiffs Original Petition | |
June 11, 2021 | ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
June 11, 2021 | JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216) | ||
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Request For Issuance Of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.