Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lakes Of Cypress Forest Community Association Inc, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Jamison, John Carl Jr., against Ceballos, Hank, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 164th with JERALYNN MANOR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJERALYNN MANOR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House164th |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed On Plaintiff'S Motion |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 11, 2021ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED
Date: June 15, 2021CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2021 | EACH PAY OWN | ||
July 19, 2021 | DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (Final Order) | ||
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DISMISSED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order: | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Nonsuit: | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE: HANK CEBALLOS: | |
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Return Mail Undeliverable | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED | |
June 15, 2021 | ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT COURT SIGNED (Temporary Order) | ||
June 15, 2021 | TRANSFERRED TO ANOTHER HARRIS COUNTY DISTRICT COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.