Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pompey, Patrice, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Beale, Jason Kyle, against Geico County Mutual Insurance Company, represented by Sood, Amar, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 164th with C. ELLIOTT THORNTON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeC. ELLIOTT THORNTON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House164th |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Non-Suit Signed |
HCDC Civil Process Request
Date: June 10, 2021ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED
Date: August 19, 2021DEFENDANTS VERIFIED ORIGINAL ANSWER
Date: July 08, 2021PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: June 10, 2021Proposed Order on Notice of Non-Suit
Date: August 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF NON-SUIT SIGNED | |
August 19, 2021 | NO COSTS ALLOCATED | ||
August 19, 2021 | ORDER OF NONSUIT SIGNED(Final Order) | ||
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Notice of Non-Suit | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intention to Take Deposition by Written Questions | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS VERIFIED ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
July 08, 2021 | ANSWER ORIGINAL PETITION | ||
July 08, 2021 | JURY FEE PAID (TRCP 216) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.