Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Trinh, Hoi, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Hinojosa, Alma A., Turner, Brian Alan, against Nguyen, Thanh Tu, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 129th with MICHAEL GOMEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL GOMEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House129th |
PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: September 15, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 09, 2020Proposed Order
Date: October 29, 2020Proposed Order to Dismiss
Date: December 18, 2020Motion to dismiss Under Texas Citizens Participation Act
Date: December 18, 2020Proposed Order on Amended Motion to Dismiss Under Texas Citizens Participation Act
Date: January 04, 2021Affidavit motion to dismiss TCPA - FILED
Date: January 04, 2021Amended Motion to Dismiss Under Texas Citizens Participation Act
Date: January 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2021 |
Dismissal Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Tu Nguyen | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Amended Motion to Dismiss | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under Texas Citizens Participation Act | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit A-1; 10-15 YouTube | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit A; Affidavit of Hoi Trinh | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit A-2; 10-17 YouTube | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit A-4; 10-24 YouTube | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit C; Declaration of Thuy Duong (Lisa) Nguyen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.