Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Espinoza, Caleb, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Garcia, Abraham, against Johnson, Damon Gerard, Texas Pride Disposal Solutions Llc, represented by Harrison, Tom Marshall, in the jurisdiction of Harris County, TX, . Harris County, TX Superior Courts 152nd with ROBERT K. SCHAFFER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROBERT K. SCHAFFER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHarris County, TX |
|
Filing Court House152nd |
PLAINTIFFS ORIGINAL PETITION AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE
Date: July 13, 2020Defendant Damon Gerard Johnson's Original Answer and Request For Disclosures
Date: September 18, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 |
STRIKE PLEAD - MTN TO (TRCP 168) Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
||
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion to Strike the Counteraffidavit of John Toohey, M.D. | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order on Motion | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike The Controverting Affidavit Of John Toohey, M.D. | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit 1 | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit 2 | |
January 19, 2021 | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 3RD PARTY ACTION (Temporary Order) | ||
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SIGNED GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE 3RD PARTY ACTION | |
January 18, 2021 |
LEAVE TO FILE THIRD PARTY ACTION Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) O/S 1/19/2021 |
||
January 18, 2021 |
LEAVE TO FILE THIRD PARTY ACTION Submission Docket (Local Rule 12) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.